Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Mauclerc de la Musanchère

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1700¹Born
17 Apr 174646.2SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
19 Sep 174646.7ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
9 Oct 174646.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
1 Apr 177575.2DiedBishop of Nantes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Mauclerc de la Musanchère
Bishop Pierre Mauclerc de la Musanchère (born 1700, died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuçon

  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 301
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018