Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Léonce-Octavien d’Antelmy

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1668BornFréjus
Dec 1694³26.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 172658.1SelectedBishop of Grasse, France
9 Dec 172658.8ConfirmedBishop of Grasse, France
12 Jan 172758.9Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
21 Oct 175284.7DiedBishop of Grasse, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-Léonce-Octavien d’Antelmy:
Bishop Claude-Léonce-Octavien d’Antelmy (born , died ) Bishop of Grasse

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015