Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-André Roussel de Tilly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orange, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1686¹Born
21 Aug 173145.6SelectedBishop of Orange, France
19 Nov 173145.8ConfirmedBishop of Orange, France
17 Feb 173246.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
25 Jun 177488.4ResignedBishop of Orange, France
30 Jul 177589.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Orange, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-André Roussel de Tilly
Bishop François-André Roussel de Tilly (born 1686, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orange

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAutun

  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018