Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Robert Hertault de Beaufort

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1668¹Born
11 Jan 172153.0SelectedBishop of Lectoure, France
23 Mar 172254.2ConfirmedBishop of Lectoure, France
7 Jun 172254.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
26 Aug 174577.6DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul-Robert Hertault de Beaufort
Bishop Paul-Robert Hertault de Beaufort (born 1668, died ) Bishop of Lectoure

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinerolo

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017