Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ennemond Allemand de Montmartin

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1659¹BornVienne
1 Nov 170748.8SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
12 Mar 170849.1ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
6 May 170849.3Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
28 Oct 171960.8DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ennemond Allemand de Montmartin:
Bishop Ennemond Allemand de Montmartin (born 1659, died ) Bishop of Grenoble

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015