Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Dreuilhet (Drouillet)

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1664BornToulouse
1693¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 170742.3SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
7 Nov 170742.9ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
8 Jan 170843.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
17 Nov 172762.9DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Dreuilhet (Drouillet):
Bishop André Dreuilhet (Drouillet) (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015