Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David-Nicolas Bertier

Deceased

Bishop of Blois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹BornToulouse
22 Mar 169341.2SelectedBishop of Blois, France
1 Jul 169745.5ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
15 Sep 169745.7Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
20 Aug 171967.6DiedBishop of Blois, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David-Nicolas Bertier:
Bishop David-Nicolas Bertier (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Blois

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015