Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent-François des Maretz

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1657³BornSoissons
22 Dec 169639.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 170244.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
31 Jul 170245.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
17 Sep 170245.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
25 Sep 173982.2DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent-François des Maretz:
Bishop Vincent-François des Maretz (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015