Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Daniel de Beaupoil de Saint-Aulaire

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1651Born
15 Apr 170250.8SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
25 Sep 170251.2ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
29 Oct 170251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
14 Jan 170351.5InstalledBishop of Tulle, France
8 Sep 172170.2ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
18 Nov 173483.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for André-Daniel de Beaupoil de Saint-Aulaire
Bishop André-Daniel de Beaupoil de Saint-Aulaire (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Aulaire

  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast