Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques-Nicolas de Colbert

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1655BornParis
6 Apr 167924.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 168025.0SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rouen, France
29 Apr 168025.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rouen, France
29 Apr 168025.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
4 Aug 168025.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
29 Jan 169136.0SucceededArchbishop of Rouen, France
10 Dec 170752.8DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Nicolas de Colbert:
Archbishop Jacques-Nicolas de Colbert (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 144, and Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013