Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Joachim Colbert de Croissy

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1667BornParis
22 Dec 169124.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Nov 169629.3SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
14 Jan 169729.5ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
10 Mar 169729.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
8 Apr 173870.8DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Joachim Colbert de Croissy:
Bishop Charles-Joachim Colbert de Croissy (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015