Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Rouxel de Médavy

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1604Born
28 Feb 165146.5SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
25 Sep 165147.1ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
21 May 165247.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
16 Jan 167166.4SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
24 Aug 167167.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
29 Jan 169186.4DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for François de Rouxel de Médavy (VIAF: 263443181)
Archbishop François de Rouxel de Médavy (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 245, and Page 336
  • b: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 66
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018