Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Colbert

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹Born
1672¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 167628.7SelectedBishop of Auxerre, France
6 Jun 167830.4ConfirmedBishop of Auxerre, France
24 Jul 167830.5Ordained BishopBishop of Auxerre, France
19 Jul 170456.5DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Colbert
Bishop André Colbert (born 1648, died ) Bishop of Auxerre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReims

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast