Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonor de Goyon de Matignon (II)

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1637Born
22 Dec 167437.2SelectedBishop of Lisieux, France
27 May 167537.7ConfirmedBishop of Lisieux, France
14 Mar 167739.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lisieux, France
14 Jul 171476.8DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Léonor de Goyon de Matignon (II)
Bishop Léonor de Goyon de Matignon (II) (born , died ) Bishop of Lisieux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorigni-sur-Vire

  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,677, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast