Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Armand de La Voue de Tourouvre

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1674¹BornTourouvre
1701¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 171642.3SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
8 Jun 171844.4ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
10 Jul 171844.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
17 Jul 171945.5InstalledBishop of Rodez, France
18 Sep 173359.7DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Armand de La Voue de Tourouvre:
Bishop Jean-Armand de La Voue de Tourouvre (born 1674, died ) Bishop of Rodez

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015