Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Daniel-Gabriel de Pestel de Levis de Tubières de Caylus

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1669Born
16 Aug 170435.3SelectedBishop of Auxerre, France
26 Jan 170535.7ConfirmedBishop of Auxerre, France
1 Mar 170535.8Ordained BishopBishop of Auxerre, France
3 Apr 175484.9DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Daniel-Gabriel de Pestel de Levis de Tubières de Caylus (VIAF: 50921)
Bishop Charles-Daniel-Gabriel de Pestel de Levis de Tubières de Caylus (born , died ) Bishop of Auxerre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceRégennes

  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast