Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Balzac d’Illiers d’Entragues

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664¹BornParis
25 Oct 171753.8SelectedBishop of Lectoure, France
8 Jun 171854.4ConfirmedBishop of Lectoure, France
24 Jul 171854.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
20 Aug 172056.6DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Balzac d’Illiers d’Entragues:
Bishop Louis de Balzac d’Illiers d’Entragues (born 1664, died ) Bishop of Lectoure

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015