Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Bénigne Bossuet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troyes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1664Born
2 Mar 171651.2SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
27 Jun 171853.5ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
31 Jul 171853.6Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
30 Mar 174277.3RetiredBishop of Troyes, France
12 Jul 174378.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Bénigne Bossuet
Bishop Jacques-Bénigne Bossuet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018