Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Alexandre Le Filleul de La Chapelle

Deceased

Bishop of Vabres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1676BornLa Chapelle Gautier
10 Nov 171034.3AppointedBishop of Vabres, France
4 Jan 171134.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vabres, France
4 Feb 176487.5DiedBishop of Vabres, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Alexandre Le Filleul de La Chapelle:
Bishop Charles-Alexandre Le Filleul de La Chapelle (born , died ) Bishop of Vabres

  • a bishop for 53.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015