Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis-Alexandre Le Blanc, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sarlat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1674¹BornVitry sur Seine
18 Sep 170632.7Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
25 Sep 172147.7SelectedBishop of Sarlat, France
14 Jan 172248.0ConfirmedBishop of Sarlat, France
15 Mar 172248.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sarlat, France
3 May 174773.3DiedBishop of Sarlat, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis-Alexandre Le Blanc:
Bishop Denis-Alexandre Le Blanc C.R.S.A. (born 1674, died ) Bishop of Sarlat

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015