Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Joseph de La Fare

Deceased

Bishop of Laon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1690BornParis
14 Aug 171827.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 172332.9SelectedBishop of Laon, France
12 Jun 172433.5ConfirmedBishop of Laon, France
25 Jul 172433.6Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
23 Apr 174150.3DiedBishop of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Joseph de La Fare:
Bishop Etienne-Joseph de La Fare (born , died ) Bishop of Laon

  • a priest for 22.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 238
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015