Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Joseph Robuste de Laubarière

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

Titular Bishop of Nitria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1684¹Born
1708¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172945.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
6 Jul 172945.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nitria
21 Aug 172945.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nitria
3 Feb 175470.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph Robuste de Laubarière
Bishop François-Joseph Robuste de Laubarière (born 1684, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngoulême, Diocese of Angoulême
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast