Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Champflour

Deceased

Bishop of Mirepoix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1683BornClermont
24 Sep 171229.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 173754.6SelectedBishop of Mirepoix, France
20 Dec 173754.9ConfirmedBishop of Mirepoix, France
23 Feb 173855.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
6 Feb 176885.0DiedBishop of Mirepoix, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de Champflour:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Champflour (born 1683, died ) Bishop of Mirepoix

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015