Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Charles-Alexandre Lallemant

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1691Born
27 Mar 172837.1SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
15 Dec 172837.8ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
23 Jan 172937.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
6 Apr 174049.1DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Charles-Alexandre Lallemant
Bishop Jacques-Charles-Alexandre Lallemant (born , died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018