Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Joseph de Gourgues

Deceased

Bishop of Bazas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640BornBordeaux
31 May 168444.4SelectedBishop of Bazas, France
12 Oct 169353.8ConfirmedBishop of Bazas, France
15 Nov 169353.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
9 Sep 172484.7DiedBishop of Bazas, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Joseph de Gourgues:
Bishop Jacques-Joseph de Gourgues (died ) Bishop of Bazas

  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013