Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de la Roche-Aymon

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1658³BornManisac
Dec 1688³30.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 170345.1SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
28 Apr 170445.4ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
22 Jun 170445.6Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
4 Jun 172061.5DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de la Roche-Aymon:
Bishop Claude de la Roche-Aymon (born Nov 1658, died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015