Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Nettancourt d’Haussonville de Vaubecourt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montauban


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1656¹BornChalons-sur-Marne
1687¹31.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 170347.6SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
11 Feb 170448.1ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
30 Mar 170448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
14 Nov 172973.8ResignedBishop of Montauban, France
17 Apr 173680.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Montauban, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Nettancourt d’Haussonville de Vaubecourt:
Bishop François de Nettancourt d’Haussonville de Vaubecourt (born 1656, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montauban

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015