Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Feydeau de Brou

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1653Born
18 Dec 167724.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 168733.9SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
24 Mar 169238.7ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
31 Aug 169239.2Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
14 Jun 170653.0DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Feydeau de Brou
Bishop Henri Feydeau de Brou (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast