Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Baglion de la Salle de Saillant

Deceased

Bishop of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661¹BornLyon
24 Dec 170746.9SelectedBishop of Mende, France
30 Apr 170847.3ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
24 Jun 170847.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
27 Sep 172362.7DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Baglion de la Salle de Saillant:
Bishop Pierre de Baglion de la Salle de Saillant (born 1661, died ) Bishop of Mende

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015