Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Gaspard de La Mer de Matha

Deceased

Bishop of Aire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660¹BornMarcillat
6 Apr 168828.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 170646.6SelectedBishop of Aire, France
21 Feb 170747.1ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
10 Apr 170747.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
3 Apr 170848.2InstalledBishop of Aire, France
30 Jun 171050.4DiedBishop of Aire, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Gaspard de La Mer de Matha:
Bishop François-Gaspard de La Mer de Matha (born 1660, died ) Bishop of Aire

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015