Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques de Verthamon de Chalucet

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1669¹BornChalucet
17 Jan 170839.0SelectedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
26 Mar 170839.2ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
24 Jun 170839.4Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
Oct 1725³56.7DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques de Verthamon de Chalucet:
Bishop Jean-Jacques de Verthamon de Chalucet (born 1669, died Oct 1725) Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015