Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Armand Chomel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orange, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1688Born
16 Jun 172133.4AppointedBishop of Orange, France
25 Jul 172133.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
18 Nov 173143.8ResignedBishop of Orange, France
25 May 178092.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Orange, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Armand Chomel
Bishop Louis-Armand Chomel (born 1688, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orange

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 58.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018