Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Jean René Brouwet

Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1962 Born
30 Jun 199128.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nanterre, France
27 Jun 199229.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nanterre, France
11 Apr 200845.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nanterre, France
11 Apr 200845.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
29 Jun 200845.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca
11 Feb 201249.4AppointedBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Jean René Brouwet (VIAF: 294781768)
Bishop Nicolas Jean René Brouwet (born ) Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuresnes
Ordained DeaconSainte-Geneviève, Cathedral, Nanterre, Diocese of Nanterre
Ordained PriestSainte-Geneviève, Cathedral, Nanterre, Diocese of Nanterre
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Church, Neuilly-sur-Seine, Diocese of Nanterre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2008
  • ob/c1: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,768
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012
  • od/c01: AJ, 30 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 May 2019

Quantcast