Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice-Louis Dubourg

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1878Born
3 Jul 190930.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 192850.3AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
25 Feb 192950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
9 Mar 192950.5InstalledBishop of Marseille, France
9 Dec 193658.3AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
31 Jan 195475.4DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Maurice-Louis Dubourg
Archbishop Maurice-Louis Dubourg (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBesançon

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017