Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Joseph-Ephrem Groshenry, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso

Titular Bishop of Boreum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1891BornTarcenay, France
29 Jun 192129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
17 Jun 193745.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
17 Jun 193745.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Boreum
14 Sep 193746.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Boreum
15 May 194149.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
18 May 196270.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph-Ephrem Groshenry:
Bishop Louis-Joseph-Ephrem Groshenry M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1937, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013