Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie Birraux, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Superior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)

Titular Bishop of Ombi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1883BornBernex, France
28 Jun 190824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
22 Apr 192036.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tanganika, Tanzania
22 Apr 192036.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ombi
23 Jun 192036.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ombi
22 Apr 193652.4AppointedSuperior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
30 Apr 194763.4DiedSuperior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Birraux:
Bishop Joseph-Marie Birraux M. Afr. (born , died ) Superior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013