Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Georges Edouard Michaud, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Uganda

Titular Bishop of Zabi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1884Born
29 Jun 191126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
17 Nov 192844.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tabora, Tanzania
17 Nov 192844.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zabi
3 Mar 192944.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zabi
24 Mar 193247.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Uganda
2 Jun 193348.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Uganda
18 Jun 194560.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Uganda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Georges Edouard Michaud
Bishop Joseph Georges Edouard Michaud M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Uganda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Anne-de-Bellevue, Canada

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018