Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Antoine-Augustin-Siméon Livinhac, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Superior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)

Titular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1846BornBuzeins, France
12 Oct 187327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
15 Jun 188336.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza, Uganda
15 Jun 188336.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pacandus
14 Sep 188438.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pacandus
28 Oct 188943.3AppointedOfficial of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
4 Dec 188943.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza, Uganda
26 Nov 189246.4AppointedSuperior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
21 Nov 192175.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
12 Nov 192276.3DiedSuperior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)

MicroData Summary for Léon-Antoine-Augustin-Siméon Livinhac:
Bishop Léon-Antoine-Augustin-Siméon Livinhac M. Afr. (born , died ) Superior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 432

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013