Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Frézal Charbonnier, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tanganika

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1842BornLa Canourgue, France
22 May 186927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
14 Jan 188744.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tanganika, Tanzania
14 Jan 188744.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
24 Aug 188745.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
16 Mar 188845.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Tanganika, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Frézal Charbonnier:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Frézal Charbonnier M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tanganika

  • a priest for 18.8 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013