Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Spiridion-Salvatore-Costantino Buhadgiar, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Haiti

Titular Bishop of Ruspae

Apostolic Delegate to Dominican Republic

Apostolic Delegate to Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1846Born
12 Aug 188437.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tunis, Tunisia
12 Aug 188437.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
31 Aug 188437.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
20 Nov 188438.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tunis, Tunisia
14 Apr 188538.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Malta
11 Feb 188942.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Malta
8 Jan 189144.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Dominican Republic
8 Jan 189144.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
8 Jan 189144.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
10 Aug 189144.7DiedApostolic Delegate to Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Spiridion-Salvatore-Costantino Buhadgiar
Bishop Spiridion-Salvatore-Costantino Buhadgiar O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Haiti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCéphalonie, Greece
Ordained BishopTunis, Vicariate Apostolic of Tunis, Tunisia

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 378, and Page 489
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017