Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Haiti

Rempublicam de Haiti



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Established: 1881
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Haïti
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 326, Petion-ville, Morne Calvaire, Port-au-Prince, Haiti
  • Telephone: (509)3271.1887; 3322.8811

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1881EstablishedNunciature to Haiti
7 June 1916ElevatedNunciature to Haiti (to Internunciature)
17 October 1930ElevatedNunciature to Haiti (to Nunciature)
10 August 1938Territory AddedDelegation to Antilles (suppressed) Nunciature to Cuba (Jamaica with its annexed territories and British Honduras)
Nunciature to Haiti (Rest of the Lesser Antilles and Puerto Rico)
Nunciature to Venezuela (Barbados and the islands of Venezuela)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024