Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Cherubini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Yugoslavia

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1865Born
13 Nov 191549.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
9 Dec 191549.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
12 Dec 191549.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
7 Jun 191650.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Haiti
2 Mar 192054.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Yugoslavia
15 Feb 192155.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Yugoslavia
12 Apr 193468.2DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Yugoslavia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cherubini (VIAF: 254365472)
Archbishop Francesco Cherubini (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Yugoslavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoriano del Cimino, Diocese of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 79
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 141, and Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast