Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignace-Marie Le Ruzic

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Les Cayes, Haïti

Titular Bishop of Madaurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1874Born
12 Jan 191641.0AppointedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
7 May 191641.3Ordained BishopBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
1 Aug 191944.6ResignedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
1 Aug 191944.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
11 Jun 193560.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Les Cayes, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Ignace-Marie Le Ruzic
Bishop Ignace-Marie Le Ruzic (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Les Cayes

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlougrescant, France

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,916, Number 20
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast