Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Mazzarotto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ponta Grossa, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1890BornSanta Felicidade
23 Nov 191424.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 192939.2AppointedBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
23 Feb 193039.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
20 Mar 196574.5RetiredBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
20 Mar 196574.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Octabia
16 Mar 197180.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Octabia
15 Jul 198089.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Mazzarotto:
Bishop Antônio Mazzarotto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ponta Grossa

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015