Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ponta Grossa

Dioecesis Ponta Grossa



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 May 1926
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Curitiba
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 23,462 (9,062 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul II
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 394, Praca MarechalFloriano Peixoto 581, 84001-970 Ponta Grossa, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (042) 224-1140

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 May 1926ErectedDiocese of Curitiba Diocese of Ponta Grossa (erected)
9 December 1933Territory LostDiocese of Lages
Diocese of Ponta Grossa
Territorial Prelature of Palmas (erected)
16 December 1965Territory LostDiocese of Campo Mourão
Diocese of Ponta Grossa
Diocese of Toledo
Diocese of Guarapuava (erected)
3 December 1976Territory LostArchdiocese of Curitiba
Diocese of Guarapuava
Diocese of Ponta Grossa
Diocese of União da Vitória (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950320,000350,00091.4%1864823,9026423023ap1951
1966397,000477,00083.2%17981153,45213823928ap1967
1970420,000530,00079.2%201261462,87614833932ap1971
1976621,201723,44985.9%251091344,63515825641ap1977
1980434,000518,00083.8%241171413,07823628536ap1981
1990510,000601,00084.9%231351583,22729335638ap1991
1999594,000698,00085.1%31991304,56920132738ap2000
2000497,364574,67386.5%34971313,79618433438ap2001
2001489,000565,67286.4%37791164,215814633438ap2002
2002556,000643,33986.4%41711124,964814436039ap2003
2003514,671643,33980.0%35801154,4752116635039ap2004
2004546,838643,33985.0%38891274,3052016235739ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014