Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Spaki

Bishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1971 Born
2 Feb 200331.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
3 Aug 200331.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
25 Apr 201846.3AppointedBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
22 Jun 201846.5Ordained BishopBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
8 Jul 201846.5InstalledBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Spaki
Bishop Mário Spaki (born ) Bishop of Paranavaí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrati, Diocese of Ponta Grossa, Parana
Ordained BishopSant’Ana, Cathedral, Ponta Grossa, Diocese of Ponta Grossa, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paranavaí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 25 Apr 2018
  • c2+: CB, 26 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast