Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sérgio Arthur Braschi

Bishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1948 Born
8 Jul 197324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
18 Feb 199849.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
18 Feb 199849.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
14 Apr 199849.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
16 Jul 200354.6AppointedBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sérgio Arthur Braschi
Bishop Sérgio Arthur Braschi (born ) Bishop of Ponta Grossa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuritiba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ponta Grossa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017