Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cláudio Nori Sturm, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1953 BornUbiretama
2 Mar 197521.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Jan 198026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Oct 200855.4AppointedBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Dec 200855.6Ordained BishopBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Jan 200955.6InstalledBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cláudio Nori Sturm:
Bishop Cláudio Nori Sturm O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Patos de Minas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Patos de Minas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2008
  • ob/c1+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,991

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013