Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Moacyr José Vitti, C.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Curitiba, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1940BornPiracicaba
9 Dec 196020.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
16 Dec 196727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
12 Nov 198746.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
12 Nov 198746.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
3 Jan 198847.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
1 Mar 198948.2InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
15 May 200261.4AppointedBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 May 200463.4AppointedArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
18 Jun 200463.5InstalledArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
26 Jun 201473.5DiedArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Moacyr José Vitti:
Archbishop Moacyr José Vitti C.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Curitiba

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,337
  • d: CB, 26 Jun 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015