Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Carlos Seneme, C.S.S.

Bishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1958 Born
23 Jan 198223.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
15 Dec 198527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
17 Oct 200748.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
17 Oct 200748.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Albulae
16 Dec 200749.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Albulae
26 Jun 201354.5AppointedBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Carlos Seneme
Bishop João Carlos Seneme C.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGertrudes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Toledo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,580
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast